ND SB2307 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subdivision? a of subsection? 1 of section 15.1-29-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to student placement for noneducational purposes.
Title
Student placement for noneducational purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. David Rust [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] |
Rep. Donald Longmuir [R] | Rep. Richard Holman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/03 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 7 |
2017-03-15 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported back, do pass 10 3 1 |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |