ND 2306 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 23-10-11 and subsection 4 of section 47-32-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to ejection from a mobile home park and maintainable evictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ejection from a mobile home park and maintainable evictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 3 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-10SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 41
2017-02-09SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-02-06SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback