ND SB2305 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-38 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a corporate income tax credit for reimbursement of employee child care expenditures; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A corporate income tax credit for reimbursement of employee child care expenditures; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] |
Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Pamela Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 12 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 32 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |