ND SB2305 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create an enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax exclusion for social security benefits; to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 57-02-08.1 and section 57-38-01.28 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the homestead tax credit and the marriage penalty credit; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The homestead tax credit and the marriage penalty credit; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Carolyn Nelson [D] | Rep. Bill Amerman [D] |
Rep. Karen Karls [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 18 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 27 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 1 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |