ND 2305 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 53-12.1-01, subdivision a of subsection 2 of section 53-12.1-03, section 53-12.1-08, subsection 1 of section 53-12.1-11, subsections 1 and 7 of section 53-12.1-12, and section 53-12.1-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to individuals eligible to play the North Dakota lottery and claim prizes and lottery online play; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individuals eligible to play the North Dakota lottery and claim prizes and lottery online play; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateSigned by Governor 03/28
2019-03-28SenateSent to Governor
2019-03-27SenateSigned by President
2019-03-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-26SenateReturned to Senate
2019-03-25HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 9
2019-03-20HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 3 1
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Hearing 09:45
2019-02-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2019-01-25HouseReceived from Senate
2019-01-24SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2019-01-23SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-23SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback