ND 2304 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 15.1-21-01, subsection 1 of section 15.1-21-02, and subsection 4 of section 15.1-21-02.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requiring all elementary and secondary public and nonpublic schools in the state to include curriculum on Native American history; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring all elementary and secondary public and nonpublic schools in the state to include curriculum on Native American history; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 47 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateSigned by Governor 04/23
2021-04-22SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-22SenateSigned by President
2021-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-19HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 76 nays 16
2021-04-19HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-16HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-16SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0
2021-04-16SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-16SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-14HouseConference committee appointed Longmuir Richter Marschall
2021-04-08SenateConference committee appointed Schaible Lemm Oban
2021-04-08SenateRefused to concur
2021-04-06SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2021-04-06HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 72 nays 21
2021-04-06HouseDivision B passed
2021-04-06HouseDivision A passed
2021-04-06HouseDivision of bill
2021-04-01HouseLaid over one legislative day
2021-03-31HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-30HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0
2021-03-24HouseRereferred to Education
2021-03-24HouseReconsidered
2021-03-23HouseSecond reading, failed, lacks constitutional majority yeas 47 nays 47
2021-03-18HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-17HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
2021-03-09HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2021-02-16HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-15SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-02-11SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-10SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2021-02-01SenateCommittee Hearing 02:15
2021-01-25SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba2304.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-1054-01000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-1054-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-1054-02002a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-1054-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-1054-02006a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-1054-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-1054-02007a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-1054-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-1054-06000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-28.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-50.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-59.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-67.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-68.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback