ND 2304 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 40-29-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to payment of assessments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Payment of assessments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23SenateSigned by Governor 03/22
2017-03-21SenateSent to Governor
2017-03-20SenateSigned by President
2017-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-17SenateReturned to Senate
2017-03-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 13
2017-03-13HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 5 1
2017-03-13HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-07SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 2
2017-02-06SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
2017-02-01SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback