ND SB2304 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 40-29-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to payment of assessments.
Title
Payment of assessments.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Roers [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] |
Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Gary Sukut [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 13 |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 5 1 |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 2 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |