ND 2303 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 14-02.4-01, 14-02.4-02, 14-02.4-03, 14-02.4-04, 14-02.4-05, 14-02.4-06, 14-02.4-08, and 14-02.4-09, subsections 1 and 2 of section 14-02.5-02, sections 14-02.5-03, 14-02.5-04, 14-02.5-05, 14-02.5-07, and 14-02.5-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibition of discrimination on the basis of sexual orientation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibition of discrimination on the basis of sexual orientation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 20 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 20 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-25SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 27
2019-01-25SenateAmendment failed
2019-01-25SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2019-01-24SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0
2019-01-23SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback