ND 2303 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsections 2 and 7 of section 12.1-32-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to registration requirements for sexual offenders; and to provide a contingent effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration requirements for sexual offenders; and to provide a contingent effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13SenateSigned by Governor 04/13
2017-04-12SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-12SenateSigned by President
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-10HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 3
2017-04-10HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-10HouseReported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-07SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-04-07SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-06SenateReported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-04HouseConference committee appointed Jones Roers Jones Hanson
2017-03-31SenateConference committee appointed D. Larson Osland Nelson
2017-03-31SenateRefused to concur
2017-03-20SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-17HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 3
2017-03-15HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-14HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 2 0
2017-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-15SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-02-14SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2017-02-08SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-01-31SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2017-01-31SenateReported back, do pass 6 0 0
2017-01-30SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback