ND SB2303 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 12.1-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the application of sections in chapter 12.1-17 to certain medical procedures; to amend and reenact sections 12.1-01-04 and 12.1-16-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of human being and the application of sections in chapter 12.1-16 to certain medical procedures; to provide directives to the department of human services regarding medicaid and other coverage for pregnant women; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The definition of human being and the application of sections in chapter 12.1-16 to certain medical procedures; to provide directives to the department of human services regarding medicaid and other coverage for pregnant women; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Margaret Sitte [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] |
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Nathan Toman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 49 |
2013-03-22 | House | Division B passed |
2013-03-22 | House | Division A passed |
2013-03-22 | House | Division of bill |
2013-03-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 6 0 |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 24 nays 23 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported back without recommendation 9 3 1 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 25 nays 22 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 3 0 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |