ND SB2302 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 39-04-14.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to providing proof of motor vehicle insurance when renewing vehicle registration.
Title
Providing proof of motor vehicle insurance when renewing vehicle registration.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Larsen [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Jason Heitkamp [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] |
Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] | Rep. Nathan Toman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 4 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 87 |
2021-03-12 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 1 2 |
2021-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 31 nays 16 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |