ND 2302 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Signed by Governor 02/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 12-60-05 and 12.1-29-07, subsection 1 of section 29-06-05.2, and sections 54-12-01.1 and 54-12-28 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to appointment of ad hoc special agents, the offender education program, authority for federal law enforcement officers to make arrests, online publication of eminent domain information, and twenty-four seven program records and statistics; to repeal section 19-03.1-44 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a drug use status and trends report; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A drug use status and trends report; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-01SenateSigned by Governor 02/23
2017-02-22SenateSent to Governor
2017-02-22SenateSigned by President
2017-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-22SenateConcurred
2017-02-21SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-02-21HouseEmergency clause carried
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 85 nays 7
2017-02-21HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-20HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 3 0
2017-02-20HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-02-15HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-14HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-02SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-02-02SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-01SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-01-31SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback