ND 2302 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 29
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for the ethical treatment of human embryos; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for the ethical treatment of human embryos; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-07SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 29
2013-02-07SenateAmendment failed
2013-02-07SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2013-02-07SenateAmendment failed
2013-02-07SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2013-02-06SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2013-02-06SenateReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 3 0
2013-01-29SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2013-01-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback