ND SB2302 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 022 nays 025
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 022 nays 025
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Kingsbury, S. Meyer, Wolf A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to extended payments for children in foster care.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Kingsbury, S. Meyer, Wolf A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to extended payments for children in foster care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-16 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 022 nays 025 | |
2009-02-13 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 009 n 005 | |
2009-02-09 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-02 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-01-30 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 004 n 001 | |
2009-01-27 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2302.html |