ND SB2300 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 81
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 81
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of human services to provide grants to school districts for student behavioral health needs.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of human services to provide grants to school districts for student behavioral health needs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 9 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 81 |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2019-02-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |