ND SB2300 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 61-16.2-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to flood plain management ordinances; and to amend and reenact section 61-16.2-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exceptions to flood plain management actions or construction.
Title
Exceptions to flood plain management actions or construction.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Sen. Gary Lee [R] | Rep. Wesley Belter [R] |
Rep. Jerome Kelsh [D] | Rep. John Wall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba2300.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-0211-02000.pdf |