ND SB2300 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 54
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 54
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact four new sections to chapter 15-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of the North Dakota commission on higher education funding; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The creation of the North Dakota commission on higher education funding; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Flakoll [R] | Rep. Eliot Glassheim [D] | Sen. Ray Holmberg [R] | Rep. Rae Kelsch [R] |
Sen. Larry Robinson [D] | Rep. John Wall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 54 | |
2011-03-31 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 1 | |
2011-03-22 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-18 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-02-09 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee |