ND SB2300 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Belter, Headland, Kaldor A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 26.1-21-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to state bonding fund coverage.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Belter, Headland, Kaldor A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 26.1-21-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to state bonding fund coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-13 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-09 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-18 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-16 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-03-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-03-11 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-03-10 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-02-11 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-10 | Second reading, passed, yeas 043 nays 000 | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-27 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2300.html |