ND SB2299 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to to provide for a legislative management study regarding the motor vehicle excise tax.
Title
AN ACT to to provide for a legislative management study regarding the motor vehicle excise tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] | Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Paul Thomas [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/16 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Concurred |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-03-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Transportation |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |