ND 2298 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-39.2 and a new section to chapter 57-40.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to sales and use tax collection obligations of certain out-of-state sellers; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax collection obligations of certain out-of-state sellers; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10SenateSigned by Governor 04/10
2017-04-07SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-07SenateSigned by President
2017-04-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-05SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-04-05SenateConcurred
2017-04-04SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-04-04HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 68 nays 23
2017-04-04HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-04-03HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1
2017-03-14HouseRereferred to Finance and Taxation
2017-03-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-09HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1
2017-02-15SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-14SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-02-08SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback