ND SB2296 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 6-09.7-02 and 6-09.7-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the Bank of North Dakota loan guarantee program.
Title
The Bank of North Dakota loan guarantee program.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Rep. Craig Headland [R] |
Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Chet Pollert [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/20 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 6 |
2019-03-08 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3 |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 6 0 0 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |