ND SB2295 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 61-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limitations on the creation and jurisdiction of irrigation districts; and to amend and reenact sections 61-09-01 and 61-09-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to permitting an irrigation district to assess lands requiring drainage as a result of irrigation works.
Title
Permitting an irrigation district to assess lands requiring drainage as a result of irrigation works.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/19 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 13 |
2019-03-11 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1 |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |