ND 2293 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of exceptions to deeds transferring title of certain types of property or relating to certain transactions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of exceptions to deeds transferring title of certain types of property or relating to certain transactions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 18 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateSigned by Governor 04/21
2021-04-20SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-20SenateSigned by President
2021-04-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-15HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 88 nays 6
2021-04-15HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-14HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-14SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2
2021-04-14SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-14SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-12HouseConference committee appointed Longmuir Klemin Adams
2021-04-07SenateConference committee appointed Burckhard Larson Oban
2021-04-07SenateRefused to concur
2021-03-26SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2021-03-25HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 86 nays 5
2021-03-22HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-19HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
2021-03-04HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-16SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-02-11SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2021-02-11SenateCommittee Hearing 09:15
2021-01-25SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba2293.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0555-01000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0555-01003a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0555-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0555-01004a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0555-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0555-04000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-29.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-50.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-52.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-65.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-66.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback