ND 2293 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 20.1-02, a new section to chapter 20.1-03, and a new section to chapter 20.1-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of the aquatic nuisance species program fund and surcharges for fishing, combination, and waterfowl licenses and requiring aquatic nuisance species fees for motorboats; to amend and reenact sections 20.1-02-16.1 and 20.1-03-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the investment of the state game and fish fund and aquatic nuisance species fees for motorboats; to provide a penalty; to provide an appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The investment of the state game and fish fund and aquatic nuisance species fees for motorboats; to provide a penalty; to provide an appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateSigned by Governor 05/01
2019-04-25SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-25SenateSigned by President
2019-04-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-23HouseEmergency clause carried
2019-04-23HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 67 nays 22
2019-04-23HouseConference committee report adopted
2019-04-23HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-23SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 6, Emergency clause carried
2019-04-23SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-23SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-22SenateRereferred to conference committee
2019-04-19SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-16HouseConference committee appointed Howe D. Anderson Zubke
2019-04-16SenateConference committee appointed Cook Oehlke Piepkorn
2019-04-16SenateRefused to concur
2019-04-12SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2019-04-12HouseEmergency clause carried
2019-04-12HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 71 nays 20
2019-04-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-04-09HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 4 1
2019-03-22HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-03-22HouseAmendment adopted
2019-03-21HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2019-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2019-02-19HouseReceived from Senate
2019-02-18SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2
2019-02-18SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-15SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-25SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/bill-actions/ba2293.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1073-01000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1073-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1073-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1073-06000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1073-02007a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1073-08000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1073-02009a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1073-09000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-1073-10000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-31.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-66.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-73.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-73.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback