ND 2293 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 90
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact sections 43-41-15, 43-41-16, 43-41-17, 43-41-18, 43-41-19, 43-41-20, 43-41-21, and 43-41-22 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the regulation of social work; to amend and reenact sections 43-41-01, 43-41-02, 43-41-03, 43-41-04, 43-41-07, 43-41-08, 43-41-09, 43-41-10, 43-41-12, and 43-14-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the regulation of social work; to repeal section 43-41-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to private practice of social work; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private practice of social work; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 2 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 90
2017-03-27HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-24HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 1
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2017-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-07SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0
2017-02-06SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
2017-02-01SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2017-01-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback