ND SB2292 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 35-03-15.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to mortgage modifications; and to amend and reenact sections 35-03-14 and 35-03-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the expiration and extension of real estate mortgages.
Title
The expiration and extension of real estate mortgages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/01 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-31 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 1 |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0 |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |