ND SB2291 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 86
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 86
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to creation of a trauma-informed practices working group; to provide for a report to the legislative management; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
Creation of a trauma-informed practices working group; to provide for a report to the legislative management; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Sen. Kristin Roers [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] |
Rep. Corey Mock [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 4 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 86 |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 5 1 0 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |