ND 2291 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 92
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 25-03.1, a new subsection to section 30.1-28-04, and a new subsection to section 30.1-28-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to powers, duties, and authority of a guardian regarding medical decisions; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Powers, duties, and authority of a guardian regarding medical decisions; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 0 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 92
2017-03-22HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 1 2
2017-03-14HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-03-01HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
2017-02-22HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-21SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-21SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-20SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-02-07SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2017-01-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback