ND SB2291 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 60-02-11 and 60-04-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the allowable time for grain warehouse scale ticket conversions.
Title
The allowable time for grain warehouse scale ticket conversions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 56 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/20 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2015-03-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 56 nays 34 |
2015-03-13 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 1 2 |
2015-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |