ND 2290 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Passed over veto, yeas 75 nays 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 54-16-04.1 and 54-16-04.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to emergency commission and budget section approval to accept and disburse federal and other funds; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency commission and budget section approval to accept and disburse federal and other funds; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - House - House Passed over veto, (Y: 75 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Passed over veto, (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Passed over veto, (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28HousePassed over veto, yeas 75 nays 11
2021-04-28HouseConsideration of Governor's veto
2021-04-27SenatePassed over veto, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-04-27SenateConsideration of Governor's veto
2021-04-27SenateVetoed by Governor 04/26
2021-04-21SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-21SenateSigned by President
2021-04-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-20HouseEmergency clause carried
2021-04-20HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 73 nays 19
2021-04-20HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-19HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-19SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
2021-04-19SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-19SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-15HouseConference committee appointed Kasper B. Koppelman Steiner
2021-04-13SenateConference committee appointed Meyer Elkin Marcellais
2021-04-13SenateRefused to concur
2021-04-12SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2021-04-12HouseEmergency clause carried
2021-04-12HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 78 nays 14
2021-04-12HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-08HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2021-03-25HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-03-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-02-18HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
2021-02-15SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-12SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-02-05SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-01-25SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba2290.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0608-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0608-04002a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0608-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0608-06000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0608-05005a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0608-07000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0608-08000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-30.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-63.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-68.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-69.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-74.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-75.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback