ND 2290 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Received from Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 50-24.6-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authorization of a Medicaid step therapy program based on the Medicare part B step therapy program; and to provide a contingent effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorization of a Medicaid step therapy program based on the Medicare part B step therapy program; and to provide a contingent effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseReceived from Senate
2019-02-01SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2019-01-31SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-01-30SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-21SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback