ND SB2290 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 54-12-33 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the authority of the human trafficking commission; and to provide for a report.
Title
The authority of the human trafficking commission; and to provide for a report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/29 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 3 |
2017-03-16 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 3 |
2017-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |