ND 2288 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a consolidated taxpayer notice containing estimated property tax levies and budget hearing information; to amend and reenact sections 11-23-04, 40-40-04, 40-40-06, 40-40-08, and 40-51.2-06, subdivision c of subsection 1 of section 40-51.2-07, sections 40-51.2-16, 57-02-53, 57-05-01, 57-05-01.1, 57-05-06, 57-05-07, 57-05-08, 57-06-06, 57-06-09, 57-06-11, 57-06-12, 57-06-15, 57-06-21, 57-13-02, and 57-15-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to assessment increase notices and property tax levy public hearings, the dates for general taxation of land by a city, notices of dates of assessments and reports for centrally assessed property, the annual meeting of the state board of equalization, and dates for school district tax levies; to repeal sections 11-23-03 and 57-15-02.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to notice of levy increases and public hearings; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notice of levy increases and public hearings; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30SenateSigned by Governor 03/29
2017-03-27SenateSent to Governor
2017-03-24SenateSigned by President
2017-03-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-23SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-23SenateConcurred
2017-03-21SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-20HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 77 nays 14
2017-03-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-09HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2017-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-13SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-02-13SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-10SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-01-25SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-01-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback