ND SB2287 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Signed by Governor 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for an insurance commissioner study of lignite coal industry insurance; and to provide for a report to the legislative management.
Title
AN ACT to provide for an insurance commissioner study of lignite coal industry insurance; and to provide for a report to the legislative management.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Wardner [R] | Sen. Howard Anderson [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Rep. Jeff Delzer [R] |
Rep. Gary Kreidt [R] | Rep. Dave Nehring [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/15 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-05 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 3 |
2021-03-03 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3 |
2021-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |