ND SB2284 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 20.1-03-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to agent fees for distribution of hunting licenses; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Agent fees for distribution of hunting licenses; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/13 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 3, Emergency clause carried |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee Hearing 11:30 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 2 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |