ND SB2281 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a statewide sexual assault evidence collection kit tracking system; to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 31-13-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the collection of samples of blood or body fluids for DNA testing; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The collection of samples of blood or body fluids for DNA testing; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Erbele [R] | Sen. Jonell Bakke [D] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] |
Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/16 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-04-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 17 2 2 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported back, do pass 13 0 1 |
2021-03-23 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |