ND SB2280 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 57-28-11, 57-28-17, and 57-28-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to permitting reappraisal of property acquired by a county by tax deed.
Title
Permitting reappraisal of property acquired by a county by tax deed.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Elkin [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Rep. William Devlin [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] |
Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 18 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 18 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Concurred |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-03-25 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 4 |
2021-03-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |