ND SB2276 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection? 7 of section 10-33-21, section 10-33-100, and subsection? 4 of section 10-33-108 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the prohibition of the diversion of restricted assets and the priority of those assets in a dissolution.
Title
The prohibition of the diversion of restricted assets and the priority of those assets in a dissolution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-30 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 1 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0 |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |