ND SB2276 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 23-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the North Dakota immunization program; to amend and reenact section 23-01-05.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reporting immunization data; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
Reporting immunization data; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Rep. Lee Kaldor [D] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Rep. Robin Weisz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/17 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/17 | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-27 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Refused to concur | |
2011-04-27 | Appoint Rep. Schmidt to replace Rep. Devlin on conference committee | |
2011-04-26 | Conference committee report rejected | |
2011-04-25 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-25 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Conference committee appointed Weisz Devlin Holman | |
2011-04-01 | Refused to concur | |
2011-03-30 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-03-29 | Request return from committee | |
2011-03-28 | Amendment adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 1 | |
2011-03-23 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-14 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-11 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 0 | |
2011-01-24 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee |