ND 2275 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for an appropriation to the department of human services relating to a director for the task force on prevention of sexual abuse of children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for an appropriation to the department of human services relating to a director for the task force on prevention of sexual abuse of children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 19 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 23 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 72
2021-04-05HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 20 1 0
2021-03-16HouseCommittee Hearing 11:15
2021-03-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
2021-02-22HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-19SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 24* nays 23 *President cast deciding vote
2021-02-17SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0
2021-02-09SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-03SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-02-03SenateReported back, do pass 5 1 0
2021-02-02SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback