ND 2275 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 15 3 3
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 6-09.4-28 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the infrastructure revolving loan fund debt repayments; to amend and reenact sections 6-09-49, 6-09.4-06, and 6-09.4-10, subsection 6 of section 21-03-07, and sections 21-03-19, 57-15-06.6, and 57-47-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the infrastructure revolving loan fund, borrowing and lending authority, reserve funds, and expanded bonding authority for counties; to repeal section 61-02-78 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a revolving loan fund for water projects; to provide a transfer; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide a bond issuance limitation; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A revolving loan fund for water projects; to provide a transfer; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide a bond issuance limitation; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 15 3 3
2019-03-12HouseCommittee Hearing 08:15
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
2019-02-18HouseReceived from Senate
2019-02-15SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2019-02-15SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-14SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2019-02-13SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-11SenateAmendment adopted
2019-02-08SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-01-22SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2019-01-17SenateRereferred to Finance and Taxation
2019-01-17SenateRequest return from committee
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback