ND SB2274 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 50
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 50
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 43-58-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the scope of practice of a naturopath.
Title
The scope of practice of a naturopath.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] | Sen. Kristin Roers [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] |
Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 43 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 50 |
2021-03-26 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 6 0 |
2021-03-23 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2021-02-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 31 nays 16 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 3 2 1 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |