ND 2274 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-23.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a community behavioral health plan as a term of parole or an alternative to incarceration; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A community behavioral health plan as a term of parole or an alternative to incarceration; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide an appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-20SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46
2017-02-17SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-02-09SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-02-02SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2017-02-02SenateReported back, do pass 7 0 0
2017-01-25SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback