ND SB2268 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 12.1-17-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to assault on a health care facility provider; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Assault on a health care facility provider; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Roers [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] |
Rep. Greg Westlind [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 11 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 35 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |