ND 2266 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Received from Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for review of occupational and professional laws and rules to update outdated references to good character.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for review of occupational and professional laws and rules to update outdated references to good character.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 5
2021-02-12SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 1 0
2021-02-11SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-20SenateRereferred to Government and Veterans Affairs
2021-01-20SenateRequest return from committee
2021-01-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback