ND 2264 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 23-01-05.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to providing notification of the report of death to the next of kin or authorized representative of the deceased.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing notification of the report of death to the next of kin or authorized representative of the deceased.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18SenateSigned by Governor 04/17
2017-04-13SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-13SenateSigned by President
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-12HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 0
2017-04-12HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-10HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-10SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-04-10SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-07SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-04HouseConference committee appointed Hatlestad M. Johnson Guggisberg
2017-04-03SenateConference committee appointed O. Larsen Clemens Heckaman
2017-04-03SenateRefused to concur
2017-03-27SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2017-03-24HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0
2017-03-22HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-21HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 2
2017-03-03HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-20HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-02-17HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-09SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-02-08SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-07SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2017-01-24SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2017-01-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba2264.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0338-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0338-03001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0338-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0338-04003a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0338-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0338-04004a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0338-06000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0338-07000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-26.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-54.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-65.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-66.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback