ND SB2264 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 50-29-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to eligibility for the children's health insurance program; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Eligibility for the children's health insurance program; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Spencer Berry [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] |
Sen. Gerald Uglem [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32 | |
2011-02-22 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 0 | |
2011-02-10 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2011-02-10 | Amendment adopted | |
2011-02-09 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 0 | |
2011-01-25 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |