ND 2263 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Committee Hearing 09:00
Pending: Joint Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: Mar 11 @ 9:00 am in Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 49-22-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to notice requirements for an application for a certificate of site or corridor compatibility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notice requirements for an application for a certificate of site or corridor compatibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-03-04HouseCommittee Hearing 01:30
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2021-02-02HouseReceived from Senate
2021-02-01SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1
2021-01-29SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-28SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2021-01-28SenateCommittee Hearing 08:40
2021-01-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback