ND 2262 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact paragraph 12 of subdivision a of subsection 1 of section 38-08-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the authority of the industrial commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The authority of the industrial commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 34
2021-02-09SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0
2021-01-28SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-01-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback